Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rocco Maria Barsanti, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1707³Born
6 Aug 173022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular Minor
13 Mar 177567.5AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
19 Mar 177567.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
20 Sep 177972.0AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
16 Oct 178477.1DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rocco Maria Barsanti
Bishop Rocco Maria Barsanti C.R.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,776
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 219, and Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast