Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Archinto

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1736BornMilan, Italy
2 Mar 176023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Mar 176023.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 176630.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
8 Dec 176630.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
20 Dec 176630.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
Jun 1769³32.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
15 Apr 177639.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
20 May 177639.7Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jul 177639.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
Jan 1781³44.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
1 Jun 179558.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
9 Feb 179962.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Archinto:
Giovanni Cardinal Archinto (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
  • a cardinal for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1776
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016