Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Badoer

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1717BornPago, Italy
11 Sep 176952.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
1 Oct 176952.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Badoer:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Badoer (born ) Titular Bishop of Sidon

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015