Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giannagostino Gradenigo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ceneda, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1725Born
21 Jul 174823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Sep 176237.2SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
22 Nov 176237.3ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
30 Nov 176237.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
19 Sep 176843.1AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
16 Mar 177448.6DiedBishop of Ceneda, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giannagostino Gradenigo
Bishop Giannagostino Gradenigo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ceneda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 158, and Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018