Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Bragadino (Bragadin)

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1699BornVenezia
2 Jun 172626.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 173333.5AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
15 Mar 173333.6Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
27 Nov 175859.3AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
23 Dec 177576.3DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bragadino (Bragadin):
Patriarch Giovanni Bragadino (Bragadin) (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 436, and Page 438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013