Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pompeio Cardinal Aldrovandi

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1668BornBologna
5 Oct 171042.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 171648.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
11 Oct 171648.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
2 Jan 171748.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
23 Mar 172960.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
24 Mar 173465.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Apr 173465.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
9 Jul 173465.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
6 Jan 175283.2DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pompeio Aldrovandi:
Pompeio Cardinal Aldrovandi (born , died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
  • a cardinal for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1734
  • c34: CB, 27 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 220, and Page 284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015