Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Blasio, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1660BornCeppaloni
30 Dec 167616.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
19 Dec 168222.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
18 Dec 168323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
11 Sep 172463.7AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
21 Sep 172463.7Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
Mar 1733³72.2DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Blasio:
Bishop Bonaventura Blasio O.F.M. Conv. (born , died Mar 1733) Bishop of Castellaneta

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1724, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015