Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccolò Paolo Andrea Cardinal Coscia

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1681BornPietradefusi
28 Mar 170524.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 172443.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
23 Jul 172443.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
11 Jun 172544.3Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jul 172544.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Domnica
5 Sep 172544.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Benevento, Italy
21 Feb 173049.0SucceededArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
8 Jan 173149.9ResignedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
8 Feb 175574.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Paolo Andrea Coscia:
Niccolò Paolo Andrea Cardinal Coscia (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
  • a cardinal for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jun 1725
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015