Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Francesco Lucini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1661BornMilano
7 Apr 168524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 May 171857.2AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
15 May 171857.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
2 Mar 172564.0DiedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Francesco Lucini:
Bishop Cesare Francesco Lucini O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1723
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015