Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio da Frosinone Pacicco, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1669³Born
15 Apr 168415.0EnteredMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
5 Apr 169223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
11 Sep 172455.5AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
24 Sep 172455.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
Mar 1739³69.9DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio da Frosinone Pacicco
Bishop Antonio da Frosinone Pacicco O.F.M. Obs. (born , died Mar 1739) Bishop of Bisceglie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrosinone

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 415
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,724, Number 41
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast