Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Gravina

Dioecesis Gravinensis

United

To: Diocese of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Gravina (di Puglia)
9th CenturyErectedDiocese of Gravina (di Puglia) (erected)
Diocese of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)
27 June 1818UnitedDiocese of Gravina (di Puglia)
Diocese of Montepeloso
Diocese of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)
11 October 1976SplitDiocese of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)
Diocese of Matera
Diocese of Matera e Irsina
Diocese of Gravina
11 October 1976SplitDiocese of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso) Diocese of Gravina
30 September 1986UnitedTerritorial Prelature of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti
Diocese of Gravina
Diocese of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)
195035,90036,00099.7%304341,055413010ap1951
197034,94647,30073.9%203231,51931359ap1971
Diocese of Gravina
198044,20046,30295.5%247311,425713513ap1981

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014