Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Antonio Morisciano

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1811Born
19 Dec 183524.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 185543.8SelectedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
28 Sep 185543.9ConfirmedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
2 Dec 185544.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
27 Sep 185846.9AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
1 Sep 190997.8DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Antonio Morisciano (VIAF: 89250970)
Bishop Raffaele Antonio Morisciano (born , died ) Bishop of Squillace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBovalino, Diocese of Gerace
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 73.7 years
  • a bishop for 53.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 291, and Page 527
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016