Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Cometti

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicomedia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1787BornRoma, Italy
23 Sep 180922.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 184456.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
28 Jan 184456.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
19 Jan 186577.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Cometti
Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Cometti (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicomedia

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1844, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016