Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Niccolò Tanari (Tanara)

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1795BornBologna
20 Sep 181722.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 182732.0AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
24 Jun 182732.1Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
2 Jul 183237.1ResignedBishop of Faenza, Italy
2 Jul 183237.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
17 Dec 183237.6AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
24 Nov 184550.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
3 Dec 185358.6DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Niccolò Tanari (Tanara):
Patriarch Giovanni Niccolò Tanari (Tanara) (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1853
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,526
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 79, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 283, and Page 384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013