Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Oppizzoni (Opizoni)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1769BornMilano
25 May 179324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
20 Sep 180233.4AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
21 Sep 180233.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
26 Mar 180434.9Elevated to Cardinal
26 Mar 180434.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
31 May 183162.1ResignedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
8 Jul 183970.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
13 Apr 185586.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Oppizzoni (Opizoni):
Cardinal Carlo Oppizzoni (Opizoni) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 52.6 years
  • a cardinal for 51.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013