Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Gravina

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1749Born
7 Apr 179242.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 179444.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
14 Sep 179444.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
20 Sep 179444.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
1 Mar 180353.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
8 Mar 181666.2Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181666.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
10 Jul 181666.5SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
23 Sep 181666.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
15 Nov 181767.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
6 Dec 183080.9DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Gravina (VIAF: 49659909)
Pietro Cardinal Gravina (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevago, Diocese of Agrigento (Girgenti)
Ordained BishopS. Andrea di Monte Cavallo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Buried Place (Original)Holy Sacrament Chapel, Cathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
  • a cardinal for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 298
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 11
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 246
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 235, and Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast