Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Filipponi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1755BornPalermo
23 Dec 178025.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 181862.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
5 Jul 181862.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
1819¹63.1DiedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Filipponi:
Archbishop Paolo Filipponi (born ) Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013