Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo D’Antoni

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1759BornPalermo, Italy
14 Jun 178324.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 181556.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
28 Jan 181656.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo D’Antoni:
Bishop Lorenzo D’Antoni (born ) Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013