Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Olivieri, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Arethusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1758BornGenova
21 Sep 178224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
3 Aug 180749.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
10 May 183476.3DiedTitular Bishop of Arethusa

MicroData Summary for Agostino Olivieri:
Bishop Agostino Olivieri Sch. P. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Arethusa

  • a priest for 51.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 87
  • bd/op/ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013