Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Carrano

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1746BornNapoli, Italy
22 Dec 177024.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 180154.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
Aug 1801²54.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
181972.1DiedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Carrano:
Archbishop Giuseppe Carrano (born ) Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 374
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,479

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013