Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriello Maria Gravina, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

Titular Archbishop of Melitene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1753BornMontevago
6 Apr 177622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Sep 179138.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
13 Nov 179138.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
10 Jul 181663.0SelectedBishop of Catania, Italy
23 Sep 181663.2ConfirmedBishop of Catania, Italy
24 Nov 181764.4ResignedBishop of Catania, Italy
Jan 181864.5AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
16 Mar 181864.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
18 Apr 184086.8DiedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriello Maria Gravina
Archbishop Gabriello Maria Gravina O.S.B. (born , died ) Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 217, and Page 451
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 261, and Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016