Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mercurio Maria Teresi

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1742BornMontemaggiore
21 Sep 176522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cefalý, Italy
24 May 180259.6AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
13 Jun 180259.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
17 Apr 180562.5DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mercurio Maria Teresi:
Archbishop Mercurio Maria Teresi (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales
  • c1: CB, 28 May 2012
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 272
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,588

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013