Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Vanni, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalů, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1730Born
29 Jul 175928.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
24 Jul 178655.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
24 Jul 178655.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
13 Aug 178655.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
28 Jan 178958.3SelectedBishop of Cefalů, Italy
30 Mar 178958.5ConfirmedBishop of Cefalů, Italy
29 Nov 180373.1DiedBishop of Cefalů, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vanni
Bishop Francesco Vanni C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalů

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 160, and Page 402
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,786, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast