Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Colonna, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1725Born
28 Jul 174822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Jul 177549.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
12 Nov 177550.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
17 Mar 179367.5DiedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Colonna
Bishop Antonio Maria Colonna O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReitano, Italy

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast