Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Ciafaglione (Cifaglione)

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1716BornAlcamo
21 Dec 175539.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Feb 178063.5SelectedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
20 Mar 178063.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
7 May 178063.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
3 Nov 178973.1DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Nicola Ciafaglione (Cifaglione):
Archbishop Nicola Ciafaglione (Cifaglione) (born , died ) Archbishop of Messina

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 287
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015