Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio de Vita

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Philomelium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1737BornCastelvetrano, Italy
4 May 176023.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 179255.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium
17 Mar 179355.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philomelium
1806²68.7DiedTitular Bishop of Philomelium

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio de Vita
Bishop Francesco Saverio de Vita (born , died 1806) Titular Bishop of Philomelium

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016