Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio della Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1742BornPalermo
21 Sep 176523.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 179249.9SelectedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
3 Dec 179250.6ConfirmedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
9 Dec 179250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
21 Dec 181169.7DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio della Torre
Bishop Orazio della Torre (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 282
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1792, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016