Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro SpanÚ

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Nemesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1757Born
10 Mar 178124.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 180144.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
28 Sep 180144.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nemesi
22 Nov 180144.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nemesi
1840²82.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro SpanÚ
Bishop Isidoro SpanÚ (born , died 1840) Auxiliary Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarsala

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1801, Number 32
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018