Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severino Maria (Giuseppe) Castelli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Numida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1711Born
25 Aug 172716.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jul 173422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Mar 176553.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Numida
1 May 176553.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numida

MicroData Summary for Severino Maria (Giuseppe) Castelli
Bishop Severino Maria (Giuseppe) Castelli O.S.B. (born ) Titular Bishop of Numida

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy
Ordained BishopPalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 316
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,517

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Jun 2020

Quantcast