Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Castello

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalù, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1708Born
22 Sep 173123.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 175546.9SelectedBishop of Cefalù, Italy
21 Jul 175547.0ConfirmedBishop of Cefalù, Italy
27 Jul 175547.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalù, Italy
12 Jul 178880.0DiedBishop of Cefalù, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Castello
Bishop Gioacchino Castello (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalù

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,755, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast