Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriele Maria (Giuseppe Pietro) di Blasi e Gambacorta, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1712Born
29 Mar 172816.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Mar 173522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 May 176452.1SelectedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
9 Jul 176452.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
29 Jul 176452.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
1 Feb 176754.8DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Maria (Giuseppe Pietro) di Blasi e Gambacorta (VIAF: 505156919245154970007)
Archbishop Gabriele Maria (Giuseppe Pietro) di Blasi e Gambacorta O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained PriestSan Cataldo, Church, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Monreale, Archdiocese of Monreale
Death PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 286
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 27
  • prof/c1/d/loc: AT, 14 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast