Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blas Antonio Olóriz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Monreale

Titular Bishop of Thagaste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1677BornBarbastro, Spain
2 Dec 173356.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monreale, Italy
2 Dec 173356.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
13 Dec 173356.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste

MicroData Summary for Blas Antonio Olóriz:
Bishop Blas Antonio Olóriz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Monreale

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 52, Number 219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 22 Oct 2013