Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Cafisi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

Titular Bishop of Aenus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1762BornFavara
23 Dec 178624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
15 Mar 183067.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
15 Mar 183067.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
Apr 1830³67.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aenus
10 Apr 184481.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Cafisi:
Bishop Ignazio Cafisi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 60
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,635

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013