Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio de Natale

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo

Titular Bishop of Danaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1750BornPalermo
18 Sep 177322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
17 Sep 182776.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
17 Sep 182776.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Danaba

MicroData Summary for Ignazio de Natale
Bishop Ignazio de Natale (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 172
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016