Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele de Vincenti

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Erythrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1749Born
2 Feb 177222.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 181768.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrum
25 May 181768.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrum
1827¹77.8DiedTitular Bishop of Erythrum

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele de Vincenti
Bishop Michele de Vincenti (born , died 1827) Titular Bishop of Erythrum

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast