Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Bagnasco

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Verinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1791Born
24 Sep 181422.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 182836.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
23 Jun 182836.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
1837¹45.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bagnasco
Bishop Giovanni Battista Bagnasco (born , died 1837) Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 393
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018