Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Francesco Paolo Antonio Denti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caltagirone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1782³BornPalermo
25 Dec 180321.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Sep 180522.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Dec 180624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Apr 183350.3AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
16 Jun 183350.4Ordained BishopBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
3 Aug 185370.6DiedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Francesco Paolo Antonio Denti
Bishop Benedetto Francesco Paolo Antonio Denti O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Caltagirone

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016