Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Baptist Maria Angelini

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Megara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1758BornPalermo, Italy
21 Dec 178224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
19 Dec 182567.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
30 Apr 182667.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megara
Jun 182869.6DiedTitular Bishop of Megara

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Baptist Maria Angelini
Bishop Giovanni Baptist Maria Angelini (born , died Jun 1828) Titular Bishop of Megara

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 260
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jun 2016