Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Filippo Cardinal Gallarati Scotti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1747BornMilano, Italy
12 Aug 179245.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 179245.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
17 Mar 179346.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Side
23 Aug 179346.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
25 Sep 179548.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
3 Oct 179548.6CeasedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
1797²49.8CeasedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
23 Feb 180153.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jul 180154.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
1814²66.8AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
26 Sep 181467.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
21 Dec 181871.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
6 Oct 181972.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Filippo Gallarati Scotti (VIAF: 89055987)
Giovanni Filippo Cardinal Gallarati Scotti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 379
  • c34: CB, 15 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 3
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016