Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Ghighi

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1752BornBibiana
10 Jun 179745.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arezzo, Italy
23 Sep 179745.5Ordained PriestPriest of Arezzo, Italy
20 Sep 180250.5AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
26 Sep 180250.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
10 Jan 183077.8DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Ghighi:
Bishop Filippo Ghighi (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 61
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015