Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pellegrino Maria Carletti

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1757Born
22 Dec 178124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montepulciano, Italy
20 Sep 180244.8AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
26 Sep 180244.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
4 Jan 182769.1DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pellegrino Maria Carletti
Bishop Pellegrino Maria Carletti (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontepulciano

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,802, Number 60
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast