Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Pippi

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1779BornMassa Marittima
28 Mar 180223.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 181536.0AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
3 Apr 181536.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
12 Jul 182445.3AppointedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
30 Dec 183960.8DiedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Pippi:
Bishop Giacinto Pippi (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 155, and Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013