Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Felice Cardinal Zondadari

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1740BornSiena
23 Dec 178040.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Mar 178242.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 178545.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
21 Dec 178545.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Adana
31 Jan 178646.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
30 Mar 178949.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
1791¹50.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
1 Jun 179555.3AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
Aug 1795³55.5ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
23 Feb 180161.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
28 Sep 180161.7Elevated to Cardinal
23 Dec 180161.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
13 Apr 182383.2DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Felice Zondadari (VIAF: 17100960)
Antonio Felice Cardinal Zondadari (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
  • a cardinal for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 64, and Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 44
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016