Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Mancini

Deceased

Bishop of Minervino Murge, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1733Born
18 Dec 175623.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179158.0SelectedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
27 Feb 179258.1ConfirmedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
4 Mar 179258.2Ordained BishopBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
1808¹74.0DiedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Mancini
Bishop Pietro Mancini (born , died 1808) Bishop of Minervino Murge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Marco in Lamis

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 290
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018