Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Sansone

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1725Born
11 May 174924.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 May 174924.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 179266.7SelectedBishop of Ischia, Italy
26 Mar 179266.9ConfirmedBishop of Ischia, Italy
9 Apr 179266.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
1799¹73.6DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Sansone
Bishop Pasquale Sansone (born , died 1799) Bishop of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 246
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018