Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michelangelo Calandrelli, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1731Born
22 Dec 175322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
20 Jan 179260.9SelectedBishop of Acerno, Italy
26 Mar 179261.1ConfirmedBishop of Acerno, Italy
9 Apr 179261.1Ordained BishopBishop of Acerno, Italy
18 Aug 179766.5DiedBishop of Acerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Calandrelli
Bishop Michelangelo Calandrelli O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Acerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCercemaggiore

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 63
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018