Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Belgium



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Augustine Kasujja, Apostolic Nuncio
  • Giacinto Berloco, Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus
  • Karl-Josef Rauber, Cardinal, Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Established: 17 July 1834
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Belgium
  • Mailing Address: Av. des Franciscains, 9, B-1150 Bruxelles, Belgium
  • Telephone: (32-2)762.20.05
  • Fax: 762.20.32

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
17 July 1834EstablishedNunciature to Belgium (as Internunciature)
23 November 1841ElevatedNunciature to Belgium (to Nunciature)
17 October 1884RestoredNunciature to Belgium

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.5, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Oct 2018

Quantcast