Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Francesco Airoldi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Venice

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637¹BornMilano, Italy
16 Nov 166831.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
8 Apr 167336.2ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
26 Jun 167336.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
30 Jul 167336.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
5 Nov 167336.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
3 Oct 167538.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
29 Nov 167538.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
5 Apr 168346.2DiedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Airoldi
Archbishop Carlo Francesco Airoldi (born 1637, died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Venice

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 191
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1673, Number 19
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Oct 2016