Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giannotto Gualterio

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1634BornCitta del Pieve
11 Dec 166733.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 166833.4AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
6 May 166833.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
13 May 168348.4DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giannotto Gualterio:
Archbishop Giannotto Gualterio (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

  • a priest for 15.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 202
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015