Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano de Gaspare

Deceased

Bishop of Sapė


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹BornDurazzo
22 Sep 163524.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 167362.4AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
11 Jun 167362.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sapė, Albania
14 Feb 168069.1DiedBishop of Sapė, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano de Gaspare:
Bishop Stefano de Gaspare (died ) Bishop of Sapė

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015